Financial history BRISTOL PRIDE

Charity number: 1166817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £196.61k £199.55k £548.96k £590.54k £845.51k
Total expenditure £110.02k £134.23k £460.44k £642.71k £899.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £111.97k £87.29k N/A N/A £39.41k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £66.46k £64.00k £127.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £280.39k £299.88k £474.31k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £202.04k £224.27k £240.58k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £68 £2.40k £3.55k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £457.05k £633.97k £888.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £3.39k £8.74k £11.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £4.11k £5.78k £11.11k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0