BRISTOL PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote equality and diversity for the public benefit and in particular the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation or gender identity. Curating or attending events in an official capacity including speaking, lobbying, raising awareness and challenging hearts and minds. To deliver the annual Bristol Pride festival and programme of LGBT events and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£845,511
Donations and legacies | £127.08k | |
Charitable activities | £240.58k | |
Other trading activities | £474.31k | |
Investments | £3.55k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£899,295
Raising funds | £11.11k | |
Charitable activities | £888.18k | |
Other | £0 |
£3,554 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £39,414 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £888.18k |
People

4 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 28 April 2016: CIO registration
- BRISTOL PRIDE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonny Allward | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aysha Marie Santiben Tailor-Whyte | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
FREDDIE DAW | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSS OLIVER HARRISON | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.61k | £199.55k | £548.96k | £590.54k | £845.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.02k | £134.23k | £460.44k | £642.71k | £899.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £111.97k | £87.29k | N/A | N/A | £39.41k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £66.46k | £64.00k | £127.08k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £280.39k | £299.88k | £474.31k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £202.04k | £224.27k | £240.58k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £68 | £2.40k | £3.55k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £457.05k | £633.97k | £888.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £3.39k | £8.74k | £11.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £4.11k | £5.78k | £11.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £420.14k | £305.04k | £236.61k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £85.20k | £22.27k | £7.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; (II) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE ACHIEVEMENTS OF LGBT PEOPLE AND THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY; (III) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING, INTERACTION, PERFORMANCE OR PRODUCING AND/OR DISPLAYING ARTISTIC AND OTHER MATERIALS; (IV) PRODUCING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PROMOTING PUBLIC EVENTS AND EXHIBITIONS, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; (V) ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND/OR GOVERNMENTAL, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LGBT PEOPLE; (VI) STAGING AND PROMOTING LGBT EVENTS AND IN PARTICULAR AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL; (VII) PROMOTING AND PROVIDING RESOURCES WHERE NECESSARY FOR PROVIDING EQUALITY OF ACCESS FOR MEMBERS OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY TO SPORTS, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT, BUSINESS OR SIMILAR OPPORTUNITIES, WHERE THERE ARE BARRIERS TO EQUAL ACCESS FOR THE TIME BEING; (VIII) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (IX) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bristol Pride
34 Portland Square
BRISTOL
BS2 8RG
- Phone:
- 07825192404
- Email:
- info@bristolpride.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window