THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD JESUS SANCTUARY NORTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organization meets regularly for the promotion of the spiritual and physical wellbeing of members and the local communities. We Engage in missions directly and indirectly through collaborations with local and international charities for the alleviation of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 May 2016: Standard registration
- RCCG JESUS SANCTUARY NORTHAMPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AKIN AKINTOLA | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMMANUEL OLAOYE | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MODUPE OLAIDE ORIMOGUNJE | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
FEYISARA ABOLADE AKINWUMI | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.15k | £66.59k | £91.46k | £120.03k | £138.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.11k | £45.40k | £61.45k | £94.26k | £107.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
6.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") WHICH IS TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 LEVENS HALL DRIVE
WESTCROFT
MILTON KEYNES
MK4 4GD
- Phone:
- 01908505444
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window