Accounts and annual returns WISH FOR A WEDDING

Charity Number: 1165738
Charity reporting is overdue by 1516 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 786 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 786 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1151 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1151 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1516 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1516 days