BLEDDFA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of the public in art, philosophy and religion through seminars, workshops, exhibitions and by other means as the trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £24,154 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 1978: Standard registration
- 13 March 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1161850 THE SIDNEY NOLAN TRUST
- BLEDDFA CENTRE FOR THE CREATIVE SPIRIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.83k | £73.09k | £63.61k | £67.87k | £56.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.59k | £100.92k | £86.84k | £75.86k | £68.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.92k | £2.65k | N/A | £27.56k | £24.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 6 MARCH 1985,27 DECEMBER 1985, 28 APRIL 1991,18 MARCH 2007 AND 1 NOVEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE EXPLORATION, PRACTICE, PARTICIPATION, EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE VISUAL, PERFORMING AND LITERARY ARTS. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH A PROGRAMME OF EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS, EVENTS AND LECTURES WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO THE LIVES OF THE REGIONAL AND WIDER COMMUNITIES AND TO INDIVIDUALS, AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BLEDDFA AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window