HISTORIC CROYDON AIRPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating on the history of London Croydon Airport from World War One until closure in 1959. Conservation of buildings and structures associated with the former airport. Operation of a micro-museum and archives of artefacts of associated people, organisations and items associated with London Croydon Airport and relating to Amy Johnson, Imperial Airways and key interwar aviation figures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 25 April 2016: CIO registration
- 07 February 2023: Funds received from 287303 CROYDON AIRPORT SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alastair Thorn | Chair | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Rudder | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy John Ovenden | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Wallace Andrews | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|||||
John Duncan Whitley | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.22k | £43.73k | £41.95k | £14.33k | £32.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.66k | £27.59k | £15.56k | £18.13k | £38.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £18.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 25 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2017 as amended on 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE; A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON THE HISTORY OF LONDON CROYDON AIRPORT AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES, B) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF BUILDINGS AND ARTEFACTS OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST RELATING TO LONDON CROYDON AIRPORT,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croydon Airport Visitor Centre
Airport House
Purley Way
CROYDON
Surrey
CR0 0XZ
- Phone:
- 07526996454
- Website:
-
historiccroydonairport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window