RUGBY AUTISM NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support families of children in the Rugby area who have Autism Spectrum conditions. Our charity Associate membership is free and benefits may typically include: discounts on workshops and webinars; rebates on entry fees and parking for days out and discounted autism friendly events. We also provide signposting and support and access to resources including books and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 June 2016: CIO registration
- RAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAY MCSORLEY | Chair | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mushing-Rimmer | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Flear | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Yuling Kao | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.98k | £9.84k | £6.40k | £11.32k | £12.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.42k | £8.53k | £11.60k | £14.44k | £14.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PERSONS WHO HAVE AUTISM SPECTRUM CONDITIONS OR RELATED CONDITIONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF SUCH CONDITIONS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING SUCH PERSONS, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND PROVIDING SOCIAL EVENTS, PEER SUPPORT, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT. (2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO HAVE AUTISM SPECTRUM CONDITIONS OR RELATED CONDITIONS, THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS, WHO HAVE A CONNECTION TO THE RUGBY AREA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT, ADVICE, SERVICES AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 LAWFORD LANE
RUGBY
CV22 7JT
- Phone:
- 07591135605
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window