Financial history MY MEDINA SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1167738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £19.26k £19.45k £18.07k £18.00k £17.42k
Total expenditure £16.12k £18.71k £17.68k £17.79k £17.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A