ADVANCE EDUCATION CENTRE (LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance Education provide education to the general public , disadvantaged and to those from poor socio-economic.So background. Its sole purpose is the advancement of education which benefits the community of Brent and the neighborhood, without discrimination or distinction of gender, sexual orientation, political, religious grounds and opinion. This aims to improve life, education and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brent
Governance
- 06 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Charles | Chair | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
BETTY UZOKWE BU | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.81k | £271.14k | £355.94k | £326.45k | £321.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.29k | £292.59k | £342.54k | £323.04k | £325.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.58k | £60.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- A) TO FURTHER BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY OF BRENT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, LEISURE, AND MENTORING WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATIONAL CLASSES BASED ON THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN HARLESDEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5
Unimix House
Abbey Road
London
- Phone:
- 02088383922
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window