Trustees BETHEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH, COVENTRY
Charity number: 1165911

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Margaret Sprouse | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GORDON THOMAS SPROUSE | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Derek Ian Seedhouse | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Kindness | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Gray | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Page | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rubacki | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN PHILIP GRINDELL | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.