CANTERBURY VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1166772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"To be a non-religious family of 'REAL PEOPLE' bringing Life & Hope to our communities, our neighbourhoods, our city of Canterbury, South East Kent and beyond...one life at a time."

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £106,466
Total expenditure: £118,587

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CV (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Brian Herring Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Christina Hatfield Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Mulford Dominic Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
MICHELLE HUGGINS Trustee 10 December 2016
BEMIX
Recently registered
MR JIM DENISON Trustee 01 September 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £179.62k £88.64k £78.83k £112.91k £106.47k
Total expenditure £206.97k £78.57k £94.79k £102.29k £118.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 November 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 November 2022 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 August 2022 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 August 2022 298 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 BIFRONS ROAD
BEKESBOURNE
CANTERBURY
CT4 5DE
Phone:
07970617120