Financial history MUHADDIS-E-AZAM MISSION

Charity number: 1169301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.42k £52.88k £69.44k £81.87k £50.06k
Total expenditure £75.87k £44.37k £63.03k £75.10k £70.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.52k £8.27k £25.84k N/A