THE GWENT BADGER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group aims to protect and study badgers, and where necessary offers assistance in dealing with the problems they may cause
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 13 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Woods | Chair | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Phillips | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Jones | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £981 | £1.56k | £1.46k | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £885 | £1.21k | £1.20k | £839 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1978, 24 APRIL 1987, 17 MARCH 1995, 22 MARCH 1996 AND 5 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF BADGERS AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITY WHICH WILL ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT BADGERS IN THE COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
GWENT AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Volland House
Lower Machen
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP10 8GU
- Phone:
- 07724911582
- Email:
- Gwentbadgergroup@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window