Financial history GOOD SHEPHERD SERVICES

Charity Number: 1165909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £810.72k £834.14k £849.28k £968.31k £906.57k
Total expenditure £572.30k £517.14k £803.18k £939.67k £893.85k
Income from government contracts N/A £235.52k £314.03k £303.45k £293.43k
Income from government grants £324.62k N/A £38.60k £188.45k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £262.03k £122.94k £159.97k £177.14k £262.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £12.50k £0 £19.23k
Income - Charitable activities £524.21k £693.63k £676.81k £774.26k £617.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.80k
Income - Other £24.48k £17.58k £0 £16.91k £0
Income - Legacies £2.50k £5.40k £19.93k £10.91k £28.24k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £572.30k £517.14k £791.18k £911.06k £850.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £28.61k £43.17k
Expenditure - Governance £736 £0 £0 £0 £1.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £12.00k £0 £0