THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MOTTRAM IN LONGDENDALE

Charity number: 1168054
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Worship according to the rites and ceremonies of the Church of England within the Parish of Mottram in Longdendale. Provision of charitable support/activity in accordance with the principles of Christian tradition across the parish and beyond (for example, activities for children, the elderly, those in need and financial support for national and international charities).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £94,937
Total expenditure: £201,556

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity and another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 July 2016: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • MOTTRAM IN LONGDENDALE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Hazel Adele Bridle Chair 10 October 2024
MOTTRAM-IN-LONGDENDALE BROADBOTTOM SCHOOL
Received: On time
Jean Russell Trustee 01 December 2023
MOTTRAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Robert Leslie Joy Trustee 15 October 2023
MOTTRAM PARISH CHARITIES
Received: On time
Sandra Gateley Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Charmian Bernadette Wilby Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Patricia Hall Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Kevin William Hall Trustee 24 March 2019
MOTTRAM PARISH CHARITIES
Received: On time
MOTTRAM-IN-LONGDENDALE BROADBOTTOM SCHOOL
Received: On time
Dejan Melovic Trustee 24 March 2019
MOTTRAM PARISH CHARITIES
Received: On time
ORGAN TRUST
Received: On time
Kathleen Mary Best Trustee 24 February 2018
THE GLOSSOP AND DISTRICT HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
MOTTRAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARGARET JEAN TAYLOR Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
DOROTHY ANN STRINGER Trustee 22 April 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £160.19k £95.27k £324.67k £123.04k £94.94k
Total expenditure £134.26k £104.92k £204.11k £124.89k £201.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 November 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 November 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 July 2024 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 July 2024 272 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Littlebrook Close
Hadfield
GLOSSOP
Derbyshire
SK13 2AW
Phone:
01613368089