WAT PA BUDDHARAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is in process of collecting funds in order to purchase premises suitable for the establishment of a temple.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 October 2016: Standard registration
- WAT BUDDHARAM (MILTON KEYNES) (Previous name)
- WAT DHAMMABARAMEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phra AOD BOONYOUNG | Chair | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHAIRAT NEWMAN | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATDA CHANAKUL | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMAREE ANUKOT | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUTAPHAT PHOTIKAENG | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARANYA BOONLERTUTHAI | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SOMPONG KOTSRANOI | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARAYA WATANANUSAK | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.85k | £383.78k | £319.01k | £299.15k | £235.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.95k | £58.89k | £51.42k | £46.57k | £48.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 OCT 2016 as amended on 16 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN MILTON KEYNES AND BEYOND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- (A) ESTABLISHING A PERMANENT TEMPLE WHERE DHAMMA CAN BE STUDIED AND TAUGHT AND WHERE MEDITATION CAN BE PRACTISED. (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO BUDDHIST MONKS AND NUNS IN THEIR STUDIES AND PASTORAL DUTIES. (C ) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF BUDDHISM AND THAI CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knuston Vale
Station Road
Irchester
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN29 7EP
- Phone:
- 01536660756
- Email:
- dhammabaramee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window