Accounts and annual returns JUBILEE SPORTS AND RECREATION FIELD

Charity number: 507662
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 March 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 March 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required