EKHAYA SKILLS CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A one-week basic business skills programme designed to provide entrepreneurial skills for use by young entrepreneurs in the informal economies of Africa. The programme is delivered via workshops staffed by student volunteers from the UK and in partnership with a local in-country agent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
- Ghana
- Uganda
Governance
- 30 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Masih Ahmed | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTENDO NYATSINE | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wankiiri | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/03/2017 | 02/03/2018 | 02/03/2019 | 02/03/2020 | 02/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.99k | £200 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days | |
Annual return | 02 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 492 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 492 days | |
Annual return | 02 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 857 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 857 days | |
Annual return | 02 March 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT,THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING IN BUSINESS SKILLS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,MICROFINANCE SCHEMES TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUISTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, YOUNG PEOPLE MEANS THOSE WHO ARE AGED BETWEEN 18-30.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Farj Services
29/30 Burlington House
69 Wellingborogh rd
Northampton
NN1 4EU
- Phone:
- 07906816327
- Email:
- admin@ekhaya.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window