Accounts and annual returns POUND PUPPY ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1167435
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 20 May 2023 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 20 May 2023 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 20 May 2023 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 20 May 2023 473 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 23 August 2022 568 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 23 August 2022 568 days late Download Open in new window