POUND PUPPY ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Finding good homes for homeless cats and dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 June 2016: CIO registration
- JULIE@POUNDPUPPY.ORG (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Shears | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Cox | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Grimmer | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Allen | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gibella Rochfort | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Newell | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE FARRELL | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.65k | £55.65k | £43.57k | £35.25k | £35.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.66k | £63.75k | £47.77k | £38.13k | £38.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 20 May 2023 | 473 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 20 May 2023 | 473 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 23 August 2022 | 568 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 23 August 2022 | 568 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS (PREDOMINANTLY DOGS AND CATS) BY PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PURPOSE TO EDUCATE, RAISE AWARENESS AND INFORM THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH ANIMALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Prospect Road
Lytchett Matravers
Poole
BH16 6ED
- Phone:
- 07736176613
- Email:
- jayne@poundpuppy.org
- Website:
-
poundpuppy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window