ST ATHAN COMMUNITY HUB AND LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of statutory library services as part of a service level agreement with the Vale of Glamorgan Council. Provision of IT services, event/meeting/leisure space to the community. Provision of private library services. Provide activities for children and adults, including crafting, book club, knitting/sewing groups, and performances. Provide library resources to local primary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,680 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 08 August 2016: CIO registration
- SACHAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mills CROMPTON | Chair | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kate Louise June Stavrides | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Malcolm Lindsay | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clifton Russell | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WILLMOT | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.72k | £16.02k | £3.79k | £2.65k | £25.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £5.64k | £4.61k | £3.92k | £27.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £12.51k | N/A | N/A | £19.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ST ATHAN IN THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ASSIST IN THE RUNNING OF THE LIBRARY AND COMMUNITY CENTRE IN ATHAN AND TO MAINTAIN, DEVELOP OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
ST ATHAN IN THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Primary School
Church Lane
ST ATHAN
Barry
Vale of Glamorgan
CF62 4PL
- Phone:
- 07396 703179
- Email:
- sachal@sachal.wales
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window