SHADEAID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shadeaid raises money through fundraising activities such as social events by selling entry and raffle tickets, auctions, selling food etc. Shadeaid also encourages donations. The main work of the charity is to assist deprived people of South Sudan mainly in the neighbouring countries where they take refuge e.g Sudan, DRC , Uganda and Kenya. Working mostly in Sudan. Priority is school children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- South Sudan
- Sudan
Governance
- 16 November 2016: CIO registration
- THE SHADE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS ALMA ZENO RIKO ETTORE | Chair | 15 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McGrath | Trustee | 27 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA ETTORE | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.28k | £4.46k | £4.54k | £2.67k | £2.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £1.03k | £250 | £2.83k | £165 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND OTHER DEPRIVED PEOPLE IN SUDAN AND OTHER AREAS AS CHOSEN BY THE TRUSTEES BY: 1. HELPING TO ESTABLISH CO-OPERATIVE SHOPS 2. SETTING UP WELL-WOMEN CLINICS 3. PROVIDING FUNDS TO ENABLE CHILDREN TO ATTEND SCHOOL 4. OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS SEEN FIT BY THE TRUSTEES TO FURTHER SAID OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 PIMMCROFT WAY
SALE
M33 2LA
- Phone:
- 01619765929
- Email:
- almaettore7@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window