ERITREAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO MEMBERE TSEBAOT MEDHANEALEM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our church has recently registered as charity and has been working hard to achieve the charities purposes ,so fare we have work with local hospital to donate blood with our volunteer to do fundraising to help our charity. We have also done get together community lunch and feed about 200 people?s came to us for Christmas lunch. We have printed t-shirts and key rings and sold that in our event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hackney
Governance
- 15 June 2016: CIO registration
- MTMCL UK (Working name)
- MENBERE TSEBAOT MEDHANEALEM CHURCH LONDON UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABRAHAM YOHANNES | Chair | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ASMELASH | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUSSIE BERAHI | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.86k | £90.89k | £95.44k | £27.79k | £195.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.13k | £23.53k | £29.46k | £17.16k | £49.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jun 2016 as amended on 15 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX TREWAHDO FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED HERETO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST OLAVES PARISH CHURCH
WOODBERRY DOWN
LONDON
UK
N42TW
- Phone:
- 07903587303
- Email:
- menbrexabot@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window