Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1166201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 13 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 April 2023 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required