Financial history BRITISH KASHMIRI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (BKCF.)

Charity number: 1170703
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.17k £65.23k £47.34k £47.02k £49.49k
Total expenditure £15.43k £55.31k £24.76k £56.08k £25.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A