ALTRINCHAM VIDEO SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the advancement and improvement of general education in relation to all aspects of cinematography and associated visual and auditory arts, crafts and skills and the public appreciation thereof in the district of Altrincham and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Trafford
Governance
- 21 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS SLATER | Chair | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HILLIARD | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RODGER BALL | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR BARRY PEEL | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £1.25k | £1.10k | £185 | £170 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £1.99k | £796 | £798 | £727 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF CINEMATOGRAPHY AND ASSOCIATED VISUAL AND AUDITORY ARTS, CRAFTS AND SKILLS, AND THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION THEREOF IN THE DISTRICT OF ALTRINCHAM AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF ALTRINCHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
435 Stockport Road
Timperley
Altrincham
WA15 7XR
- Phone:
- 07701063027
- Email:
- ebarrypeel@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window