WOODMANSEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Woodmansey Primary School PTFA is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. Also by engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 March 2016: Standard registration
- WOODMANSEY PTFA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Draper | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sara Willmore Hurst | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75k | £4.09k | £5.98k | £849 | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £4.31k | £4.56k | £1.69k | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodmansey C of E School
Hull Road
Woodmansey
Beverley
HU17 0TH
- Phone:
- 01482862186
- Email:
- woodmanseyptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window