Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TOWER ROAD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1166748
Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 March 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required