ORANGES AND LEMONS (CYMRU)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Area's we cover are from neath to carmarthen. All clients must be refered by a service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/06/2020 | 05/06/2021 | 05/06/2022 | 05/06/2023 | 05/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.28k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 June 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 June 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 87 days late | |
Annual return | 05 June 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 107 days late | |
Annual return | 05 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 24 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THROUGHOUT WALES (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN PARTICULAR BUT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. COLLECTING USEABLE ITEMS FROM THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OTHER LOCAL AND PUBLIC SERVICES FOR DISTRIBUTION TO THOSE IN NEED OF THEM; 2. PAT TESTING AND CLEARING ALL ELECTRICAL ITEMS ENSURING THEY ARE SAFE FOR PURPOSE AND READY FOR DONATION TO CLIENTS IN NEED; 3. PROVIDING CLEAN SAFE DONATED HOUSEHOLD ITEMS, CLOTHES, TOYS, HOMEWARE, BEDDING AND OTHER NECESSITIES TO CLIENTS AND ORGANISATIONS WHO SERVE THOSE IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 4. LIAISING WITH ORGANISATIONS INCLUDING: SOCIAL SERVICES, WOMAN’S AID, HEALTH VISITORS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES AND BY PROVIDING A SERVICE TO THEIR CLIENTS (REFERRED TO US THROUGH THEM) OFFERING THEM CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE; 5. PROVIDE SERVICES ON A DONATION BASIS OR FREE OF CHARGE WHERE APPLICABLE TO THE CLIENT’S FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; AND BY 6. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO CLIENTS IN THE FORM OF REFERRALS FOR ASSISTANCE AND SIGNPOSTING THEM TO SUITABLE SERVICES THAT WILL ASSIST IN RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS THAT WE CANNOT PROVIDE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: COUNSELLING SERVICES, WOMAN’S AID SERVICES, SOCIAL SERVICES AND FOOD BANKS.
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window