Financial history NEWBY AND SCALBY LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity Number: 1168661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.85k £34.71k £15.03k £20.07k £32.31k
Total expenditure £43.10k £13.57k £22.99k £22.37k £22.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £850 £20.66k £1.37k £1.12k £1.00k