Trustees NEWBY AND SCALBY LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity Number: 1168661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS I. E. NIXON MA Chair 05 August 2016
None on record
Dr Gillian Furze Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Janet Kathryn Merritt Trustee 01 January 2024
NEWBY FUN FACTORY LIMITED
Received: On time
Sharon Jane Coman Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Christine Stephenson Trustee 25 August 2022
None on record
MRS J. WOODROFFE MBCHB Trustee 05 August 2016
None on record
MRS L. NEWTON BA Trustee 05 August 2016
None on record