FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS SCHOOL, APPLEY BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of pupils on the school, through developing effective relationships between staff, parents and also the engaging in activities or providing facilities/equipment which supports the school and advances the education of the pupils. This is achieved through various fundraising activities throughout the year and also of the holding of social events for the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elizabeth Hazlehurst | Chair | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Ackerley | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Green | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Alison Whitaker | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL EDWARDS BARROTT | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET DUNN | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.18k | £11.64k | £10.74k | £16.91k | £19.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.15k | £5.04k | £15.48k | £14.84k | £19.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCT 2012 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints C Of E Primary School
Finch Lane
Appley Bridge
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN6 9DT
- Phone:
- 01257252647
- Website:
-
appleybridgeallsaints.lancs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window