HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND VISUAL IMPAIRMENT SUPPORT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hi-Vis UK is raising awareness and increasing support for people with acquired dual sensory loss (deafblindness)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £116,210 from 15 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
- HI-VIS UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Richelle Christie Duffy | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANICE LAVERS | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SUTTON | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH MAUREEN WINSPEAR | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.88k | £179.40k | £129.30k | £112.44k | £116.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.95k | £162.37k | £114.17k | £111.22k | £114.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £116.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
1. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE CHALLENGES FACED BY DUAL SENSORY IMPAIRED PEOPLE INCLUDING BY HIGHLIGHTING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH ACQUIRED DUAL SENSORY IMPAIRMENT AND ASSOCIATED ACQUIRED COMMUNICATION DISORDERS; AND 2. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF THOSE CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH, OR FACING, DUEL SENSORY IMPAIRMENT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Havelock Street Day Centre
Centre for Independent Living Build
Burbank Street
HARTLEPOOL
TS24 7NY
- Phone:
- 07870 891807
- Email:
- david.sutton@hi-vis.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window