PILTON GREEN MAN CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pilton Green Man CIO organises the Pilton Green Man Day in July each year and puts on a pantomime in February each year and uses the money raised by these two events to make small grants available to community organisations, charities, groups and individuals to carry out projects which will benefit the people of Pilton, Barnstaple.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS VERNON CLARKE MA | Chair | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Willcox Mr | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ann Robinson | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryn Leslie Rees | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER CLARE DAVIES | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH O'GRADY | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARC BRAYLEY | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN VICTOR HADDRILL | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.30k | £161.85k | £29.24k | £21.58k | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.33k | £3.93k | £14.63k | £19.69k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FACILITATING THE DEVELOPMENT OF A VOLUNTEER FORCE TO ASSIST THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF PILTON, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE PILTON WARD OF BARNSTAPLE, DEVON AND WILL BE ACHIEVED THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS OR PROVIDING OTHER SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 THE ROCK
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1PN
- Phone:
- 01271372416
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window