KEYSTONE PALLIATIVE SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alsager-based Charity for people in suffering life-changing illness.If you are a patient of any of the GP Surgeries in: Alsager; Scholar Green or Rode Heath Keystone provides free of charge support, complementary therapy and nurse advice services to people living with a long term life-limiting illness. We also provide services for the carers of patients and for the bereaved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 07 April 2016: CIO registration
- KEYSTONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Kay | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Knight | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICK SALT | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE EDGE RGN, DN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE KEY RGN, DN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.15k | £3.81k | £3.81k | £5.65k | £4.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.61k | £3.80k | £3.80k | £10.94k | £7.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
“THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PATIENTS WITH LIFE-LIMITING ILLNESSES, THEIR CARERS AND THE BEREAVED LIVING IN THE TOWN OF ALSAGER AND THE PARISHES OF CHURCH LAWTON AND ODD RODE AND OTHER ADJOINING PARISHES OR TOWNS AS THE CIO BOARD MAY WISH TO ADD FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION OF SUPPORT SERVICES. LIFE-LIMITING ILLNESSES FOR THIS CIO INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO, ALL FORMS OF CANCER, MOTOR NEURONE DISEASE, MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND SOME FORMS OF DEMENTIA.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
Homefields
9 Chells Hill
Church Lawton
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 3FB
- Phone:
- 01270875383
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window