PURPLE WINGS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Purple Wings Charity works throughout the United Kingdom to support people with ostomies regain confidence and self-esteem. We do this through offering personalised experience days to ostomates ranging from shopping vouchers through to family days out to show that life after ostomy surgery can still be fulfilling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAUREN HENDERSON | Chair | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Minton | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR PATRICK JUKES | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIERAN HENDERSON | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.37k | £20.92k | £24.40k | £17.63k | £3.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.23k | £19.50k | £17.67k | £17.75k | £7.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 436 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL & MENTAL SICKNESS AS WELL AS BOOSTING OF CONFIDENCE & SELF-ESTEEM OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF IMAGE ALTERING SURGERY AFTER CROHN'S AND / OR COLITIS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR EXPERIENCE DAYS AND SUPPORT THROUGH ONLINE COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Barn
Penrhos
Raglan
USK
Gwent
NP15 2DE
- Phone:
- 01562700616
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window