Financial history CANCER ASSESSMENT RAPID EARLY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1168325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £107.11k £121.86k £185.09k £213.63k £270.25k
Total expenditure £38.17k £109.16k £109.53k £137.93k £375.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £43.50k N/A N/A N/A