FIRST STEPS PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide care and Education for 2-4 year olds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income includes £107,712 from 1 government contract(s) and £838 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 May 2016: CIO registration
- 02 February 2017: Funds received from 1020392 FIRST STEPS PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Simon Lickess | Chair | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth English | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marilyn Hayes | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise West | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Margaret Amberley Colman | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.37k | £96.44k | £117.03k | £123.64k | £137.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.50k | £126.03k | £114.50k | £128.28k | £136.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £77.47k | £107.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | £107.10k | £58.40k | £95.96k | £13.92k | £838 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 June 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 05 June 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; (6) FOLLOWING THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE (OR EQUIVALENT) GUIDELINES; AND (7) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old School Hall
Church Road
Barlestone
Nuneaton
Warwickshire
CV13 0EE
- Phone:
- 01455292083
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window