THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, BIRCHFIELD, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Public Worship, open to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 11 July 2016: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY, BIRCHFIELD, BIRMINGHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Marie Rutherford | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anderson | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Amanda Flowers | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Walker | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DELORES HARRIS | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JEAN SIMMS | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN DE COSTA | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EVADNEY VERONA CHRISTIAN | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ORVILLE RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JEAN CROSS | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEANORA SCOTT | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.18k | £66.75k | £72.24k | £119.00k | £109.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.54k | £93.21k | £54.26k | £85.00k | £89.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £119.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2023 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2023 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 January 2021 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
213 BIRCHFIELD ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B20 3DG
- Phone:
- 01213564241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window