WELSH ASSOCIATION OF MALE CHOIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and promote an appreciation of music through education and practice, in order, inter alia, to promote male choral singing in the United Kingdom and elsewhere around the World.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 01 August 1978: Standard registration
- THE WELSH ASSOCIATION OF MALE CHOIRS, SOUTH WALES BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CLIFFORD REYNOLDS | Chair | 08 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Newman | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CHRISTOPHER EVANS | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.60k | £3.96k | £4.16k | £4.06k | £35.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £2.13k | £3.84k | £9.27k | £28.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/11/1977 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2015 as amended on 21 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE AN APPRECIATION OF MUSIC THROUGH EDUCATION AND PRACTICE, IN ORDER, INTER ALIA, TO PROMOTE MALE CHORAL SINGING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AROUND THEWORLD.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AND WEST WALES AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
NANTYGLEISIAD
PORTHYRHYD
CARMARTHEN
SA32 8PS
- Phone:
- 01267275421
- Email:
- johncoch@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window