Accounts and annual returns DEEDPRIDE LIMITED

Charity number: 1166923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2022 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2022 366 days late Download Open in new window