THE BOSTON STUMP RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Stephenson | Chair | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Sally Ann Clifton | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Marianne Alison Louis Fairman | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Ladner | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Alyson Buxton | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL COOPER | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.25k | £1.21m | £42.05k | £100.55k | £200.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.88k | £118.47k | £73.99k | £205.85k | £78.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.21m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £190 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £35 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.21m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £118.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £100.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
THE RESTORATION, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT BOTOLPH, BOSTON IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN, ITS FURNITURE AND ORNAMENTS AND ECCLESIASTICAL PROPERTY CONNECTED THEREWITH (INCLUDING CHURCH HOUSE AT NO 1 WORMGATE AND THE BLENKIN MEMORIAL HALL).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory Offices
1 Wormgate
Boston
PE21 6NP
- Phone:
- 01205310929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window