LIDO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lido Foundation provide the following service. Information and Advice: We provide advice on welfare, benefits, housing, debt, application support to people from disadvantaged backgrounds. The service is open 3 days a week. By signposting and advising residents, the Lido Foundation is reducing social exclusion. Instead of falling homeless or into other desperate circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £85,952 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamal Hassan | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Safi Mohamed Ali | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farhia Yusuf | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.08k | £410.13k | £496.63k | £252.08k | £240.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.78k | £304.16k | £497.26k | £247.49k | £135.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.88k | £187.69k | £291.05k | £79.00k | £85.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 DEC 2016 as amended on 15 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SOMALIA, KENYA & UGANDA BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY AID IN DISASTER STRICKEN AREAS. THE PREVENTION OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING LONG TERM SUSTAINABLE PROJECTS TO THOSE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office E
Stebbing House
5 Queensdale Crescent
LONDON
W11 4TE
- Phone:
- 02081506165
- Email:
- Info@lidofoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window