Accounts and annual returns THE MCLAY DEMENTIA TRUST

Charity number: 1170225
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 29 April 2024 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required