Accounts and annual returns ATLANTIC WHALE AND DOLPHIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167109
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 13 December 2024 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 13 December 2024 351 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 February 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 22 February 2023 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 January 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 31 January 2022 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 January 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 12 January 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window