Accounts and annual returns NEW BEGINNINGS COUNSELLING FOR WOMEN

Charity number: 1169448
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 August 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 August 2021 13 days late
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On Time