Financial history NEW BEGINNINGS COUNSELLING FOR WOMEN

Charity number: 1169448
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £2.90k £1.28k £1.28k £925 £121
Total expenditure £2.45k £1.82k £1.82k £1.83k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A