SALZBURG EASTER FESTIVAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support advancement of the education and appreciation of classical music within local communities and across the world, but particularly in regions where public sector support for the arts has been substantially reduced; and support talented musicians and orchestras/events currently struggling for public funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
Governance
- 07 June 2016: Standard registration
- SPRING MUSIC FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALBERTO BADINO | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SALIM ABDOOL HAMID MOOLLAN | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCISCO GAUDIER FARGAS | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MICHAEL BERGER-SANDHOFER | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.09k | £20.41k | £17.08k | £48.03k | £37.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £17.08k | £1.81k | £62.76k | £33.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 May 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AESTHETIC EDUCATION AND THE CULTIVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE IN MUSIC, OPERA OR THE OTHER ARTS AND THE DOING OF ALL SUCH THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS, INCLUDING SPECIFICALLY THE SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS IN ANY WAY CONNECTED WITH THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Cliveden Place
London
SW1W 8HD
- Phone:
- 02079018947
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window