Financial history CARNFORTH & DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1168103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.88k £55 £5.10k £6.32k £7.97k
Total expenditure £4.75k £281 £5.02k £6.81k £7.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A