IMPERIAL HEALTH CHARITY

Charity number: 1166084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Imperial Health Charity helps our hospitals do more through grants, arts, volunteering and fundraising. Supporting the five London hospitals of Imperial College Healthcare NHS Trust, we fund major redevelopments, research and medical equipment, manage a vibrant art collection and run a dynamic hospital volunteering programme - above and beyond what the NHS can do on its own.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 2016: Standard registration
  • 12 November 2018: Funds received from 326787 J M CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1128929-2 IMPERIAL COLLEGE HOSPITALS CHARITY
  • 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1128929 IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE CHARITIES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andreas Raffel Chair 15 July 2024
None on record
Felicity Alexandra Cooper Trustee 24 April 2025
AAGBI FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Christiane Antje Birgit Elsenbach Trustee 05 March 2024
KNIGHTSBRIDGE SCHOOL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Robert Alexander Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Sandra Husbands Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Babs Evans Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Tingting Peng Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
MICHELLE DIXON Trustee 13 June 2016
None on record
PROFESSOR JULIAN REDHEAD Trustee 19 April 2016
BASICS LONDON (NORTH EAST METROPOLITAN ACCIDENT UNIT)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.29m £7.13m £6.14m £5.69m £7.19m
Total expenditure £9.39m £10.87m £9.13m £8.96m £8.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.61m £5.61m £4.47m £4.03m £5.48m
Income - Other trading activities £240.91k £125.00k £1.09k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.69m £1.39m £1.63m £1.67m £1.72m
Income - Other £750.00k £0 £45.00k £3.29k £0
Income - Legacies £451.35k £277.00k £477.36k £609.35k £2.03m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.40m £9.58m £7.72m £8.15m £7.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.99m £1.29m £1.42m £808.14k £1.01m
Expenditure - Governance £27.63k £21.00k £24.94k £1.72m £79.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.94m £6.39m £4.01m £4.05m £3.09m
Expenditure - Investment management £437.12k £156.00k £298.79k £167.07k £161.85k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.89m £1.89m £1.89m £1.99m £3.05m
Long-term investments £73.46m £87.85m £90.99m £88.61m £96.60m
Other assets £11.69m £10.68m £8.61m £5.44m £4.93m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £7.54m £9.30m £9.03m £9.20m £7.75m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11th Floor
5 Merchant Square
London
W2 1AY
Phone:
02038579840